Coffee Room

Discuss anything here - everything that you wish to discuss with fellow engineers.

12763 Members

Join this group to post and comment.

# VM3 multiplication by 11

Carrying out two workshops3 and 4 to extend a helping hand to crazyboy! These are my favourite techniques..

To multiply any number by 11 simply write the extreme right digit of the number to be multiplied by 11 as it is in the answer(as the extreme right digit) and add the two digits right the anwer as middle digit of the answer if any carry then add it to the extreme left digit of the number and right the answer as the extreme left digit of the answer!The answer is ready shimple and shweet! 😀

*****extreme *********Middle************* Extreme

****** left ********************************right

23*11= 2 / (3+2=5 no carry generated) / 3 (as it is)=253 is the answer!

eg- 56*11= (1+5=6) 6 /( 5+6=11);1 carry/6=616

can take up numbers of your choice for practise!

To multiply any number by 11 simply write the extreme right digit of the number to be multiplied by 11 as it is in the answer(as the extreme right digit) and add the two digits right the anwer as middle digit of the answer if any carry then add it to the extreme left digit of the number and right the answer as the extreme left digit of the answer!The answer is ready shimple and shweet! 😀

*****extreme *********Middle************* Extreme

****** left ********************************right

23*11= 2 / (3+2=5 no carry generated) / 3 (as it is)=253 is the answer!

eg- 56*11= (1+5=6) 6 /( 5+6=11);1 carry/6=616

can take up numbers of your choice for practise!

this is a great work by integrated Brain....integratdbrainsCarrying out two workshops3 and 4 to extend a helping hand to crazyboy! These are my favourite techniques..

To multiply any number by 11 simply write the extreme right digit of the number to be multiplied by 11 as it is in the answer(as the extreme right digit) and add the two digits right the anwer as middle digit of the answer if any carry then add it to the extreme left digit of the number and right the answer as the extreme left digit of the answer!The answer is ready shimple and shweet! 😀

*****extreme *********Middle************* Extreme

****** left ********************************right

23*11= 2 / (3+2=5 no carry generated) / 3 (as it is)=253 is the answer!

eg- 56*11= (1+5=6) 6 /( 5+6=11);1 carry/6=616

can take up numbers of your choice for practise!

In btw this great task...am adding one more method of multiplying any digit by 11.....

add 0 in right and left of the digit and add extreme two right digit then next two then next two till last...

Don't forget carry over...

Ex.

11*

243

Make 243 = 02430-> [(2+0=2)(2+4=6)(3+4=7)(0+3=3)]= 2673

Understood...

Any doubts are welcomed.....

add 0 in right and left of the digit and add extreme two right digit then next two then next two till last...

Don't forget carry over...

Ex.

11*

243

Make 243 = 02430-> [(2+0=2)(2+4=6)(3+4=7)(0+3=3)]= 2673

Understood...

Any doubts are welcomed.....

😲 😲 😲

thanks integrd and crazyboy. nice technique !

thanks integrd and crazyboy. nice technique !

**great!**

hey crazyboy u have given a very simple technique i was unaware of! its really very shimple! thanks!

There is a another trick ...... almost same....integratdbrainshey crazyboy u have given a very simple technique i was unaware of! its really very shimple! thanks!

but we can multiply any no with any no...with that trickk...

Wait n Watch for its term to come...

wow!!! i am waiting crazy... i am waiting 4 more!!

waiting for the trick crazyboy.

Hope I could find something for the section.

Hope I could find something for the section.

wow! it was really a good one... this will help in aptitude tests a lot...

let it be out crazyboy !!!!crazyboyThere is a another trick ...... almost same....

but we can multiply any no with any no...with that trickk...

Wait n Watch for its term to come...