Kaustubh Katdare

Electrical

19 May 2006

**Vedic Mathematics !**

Guys!

Not many are aware of the fantastic world of Vedic Mathematics. I think we can have interesting discussions on mental math techniques. I'll work on getting some starter tips & tricks for the benefit of CEans.

Feel free to add your thoughts! 😀

Not many are aware of the fantastic world of Vedic Mathematics. I think we can have interesting discussions on mental math techniques. I'll work on getting some starter tips & tricks for the benefit of CEans.

Feel free to add your thoughts! 😀

**-The Big K-**rick

Branch Unspecified

19 May 2006

**is it me?**

I'm not quite sure of whats being talked here 😕 . What is vedic mathematics? I never heard about it.

Where do they use vedic mathematics? can someone explain?

Kaustubh Katdare

Electrical

20 May 2006

**Vedic Mathematics explained**

Hi Rick,

Allow me to explain. Vedic Mathematics is a system of mental-calculations. In the middle of 20th century, this system of mental calculations was developed by Shri Bharati Krishna Tirthaji. The system has roots in ancient Indian Vedas.

The system evolves around 16 basic 'sutras' or rules. The rules (probably we'll discuss them in quantitative ability section) are the foundation of mental calculation techniques. The rules are very simple and can be easily understood.

I'll put the simple techniques of Vedic mathematics later. Keep watching this thread. I'm sure we have a lot to learn here ! 😀

**-The Big K-**

crook

Branch Unspecified

21 May 2006

That's a good explanation, big K. I have a couple of mental math tricks too. I'll post them here. I think we should have separate threads for discussiing various techniques. What do you think?

Really great initiative!

Really great initiative!

Jerry

Branch Unspecified

21 May 2006

good thread. I had a chance to learn some mental math tricks few years ago and I'll be glad to share them with you.

as crook suggested, start a new thread for each technique.

Jerry

as crook suggested, start a new thread for each technique.

Jerry

Kaustubh Katdare

Electrical

21 May 2006

**bring them on !**

That's fantastic crook & jerry!

Feel free to start new threads for discussions. But plesae do make sure that the threads are titled appropriately. The title should give an idea about the discussion going on in the thread.

I'll start with some basic tips. I'm sure many of us already know them but its always better to start with the basics 😉

Looking for some great posts!

**-The Big K-**

Anil Jain

Civil

22 May 2006

Hey biggi....The_Big_KI'll put the simple techniques of Vedic mathematics later. Keep watching this thread. I'm sure we have a lot to learn here ! 😀

-The Big K-

Am waiting for some of the techniques....

If draft isnot ready you can giveme some raw data or link on PM...

thanks in advance

--Crazy

Kaustubh Katdare

Electrical

22 May 2006

Hi Crazyboy!

I need to compile some data which I've in books and articles on internet. I'll need some time to do that. Meanwhile, you may gather some information from Internet and start a new thread. Let us not 'copy' the articles from somewhere. Instead, let's write articles ourselves.

I need to compile some data which I've in books and articles on internet. I'll need some time to do that. Meanwhile, you may gather some information from Internet and start a new thread. Let us not 'copy' the articles from somewhere. Instead, let's write articles ourselves.

**-The Big K-**Anil Jain

Civil

03 Jul 2006

Some techniques of VM..(Vedic mathamatics...)

* Multiplication of two digit no.

Multiply 73 *37

It will easily take around 50 sec for a person to solve it...

but with VM one can solve it within 25 sec... so it will save your 25 sec....Half the time...This shows the effieiency of the VM...

trick is :

73

37 *

-----

3*7= 21(right hand side)

take 1, carry over 2

now 7*7+3*3+ carry over (2)=60

take 0, carry over 6

[now multiply 7*3=21(left hand side) + carryover 6] = 27

so arrange this ...

[{now multiply 7*3=21 + carryover 6 = 27}{now 7*7+3*3+ carry over (2)=62}{take 1 }] = 2701

This is looking very long procedure...

But i am sure if you will try a little you will be able to solve any multiplication problem up to 2 digit with in 20-25 sec easily....

Next lesson tomorrow...till than bbye

--Crazy

* Multiplication of two digit no.

Multiply 73 *37

It will easily take around 50 sec for a person to solve it...

but with VM one can solve it within 25 sec... so it will save your 25 sec....Half the time...This shows the effieiency of the VM...

trick is :

73

37 *

-----

3*7= 21(right hand side)

take 1, carry over 2

now 7*7+3*3+ carry over (2)=60

take 0, carry over 6

[now multiply 7*3=21(left hand side) + carryover 6] = 27

so arrange this ...

[{now multiply 7*3=21 + carryover 6 = 27}{now 7*7+3*3+ carry over (2)=62}{take 1 }] = 2701

This is looking very long procedure...

But i am sure if you will try a little you will be able to solve any multiplication problem up to 2 digit with in 20-25 sec easily....

Next lesson tomorrow...till than bbye

--Crazy

Anil Jain

Civil

03 Jul 2006

exercise for today...

74*57

53*39

43*97

93*87

49 *95

Enjoy VM...

--Crazy

74*57

53*39

43*97

93*87

49 *95

Enjoy VM...

--Crazy

Kaustubh Katdare

Electrical

03 Jul 2006

**Good initiative!**

Crazyboy - this a fantastic initiative from your side 😀

Consider starting a new thread for each new technique. It will make search easier & CEans will be able to discuss new technieque in its own thread. It will also help to keep the discussions separate.

**-The Big K-**

crook

Branch Unspecified

03 Jul 2006

**great work done !**

great job crazyboy 😁

start a new thread for this discussion as biggie says 😁

sttepz

Branch Unspecified

06 Jul 2006

this is damn kewl !!! keep it up crazy!!!!

rick

Branch Unspecified

13 Jul 2006

Vedic mathematics rocks 😁. I wish I knew this before 😕

Neha

Branch Unspecified

16 Jul 2006

**gr8!!!**

I could never think of it...gr8 job Crazyboy!!!

Mahesh

Branch Unspecified

08 Oct 2006

Hi friends,

I got few techniques for multiplication.To start with ,I want to you about multiplication with 11.

consider an example 45*11

The answer is 495

To do this,just keep units place as it is.Then start add it with its adjacent digits here it is (5+4=9).9 will be next digit.continue this until you end up with first digit.

consider another example with 3 digit number...

Eg: 375*11

First digit of ans=5

Second digit of ans=5+7=12=2(As it is >10,1 is added to next digit and digit will be 2)

Third digit of ans=7+3=10+1=11=1

Fouth digit of ans=3+1=4

so answer is 4125

Please fell free to ask any doubts......

I got few techniques for multiplication.To start with ,I want to you about multiplication with 11.

consider an example 45*11

The answer is 495

To do this,just keep units place as it is.Then start add it with its adjacent digits here it is (5+4=9).9 will be next digit.continue this until you end up with first digit.

consider another example with 3 digit number...

Eg: 375*11

First digit of ans=5

Second digit of ans=5+7=12=2(As it is >10,1 is added to next digit and digit will be 2)

Third digit of ans=7+3=10+1=11=1

Fouth digit of ans=3+1=4

so answer is 4125

Please fell free to ask any doubts......

Mahesh

Branch Unspecified

08 Oct 2006

As you can see multiplication with 11,you can follow same method for 12,...19 with some variation.

Consider an example 486*12

for this,6*2=12

8*2+6=22

4*2+8=16

4=4

Answer will be 4/16/22/12= 5832

We can use this for other multiplicands also by replacing 2 by 3,...9 to get respective results.

Please feel free to ask any doubts....

Consider an example 486*12

for this,6*2=12

8*2+6=22

4*2+8=16

4=4

Answer will be 4/16/22/12= 5832

We can use this for other multiplicands also by replacing 2 by 3,...9 to get respective results.

Please feel free to ask any doubts....

Only logged in users can reply.